+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
- Reenrolled
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1686ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1686ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105334D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105334D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1686S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105334D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104624D-H1
- Committee substitute reconsidered 11104624D-H1
- Committee substitute rejected 11104624D-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104867D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1686H2
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104867D-H2
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Committee substitute printed 11104624D-H1
- Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned S & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103228D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2011: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor