+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
On April 7, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1682ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (38-Y 1-N)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 14, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1682ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD6874260-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD6874260-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD6874260-S1
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD5143260-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5143260-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD5143260-H1
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed LD1782376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (38-Y 1-N)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: Reported from Local Government w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor