+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 419 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1682ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104545D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1682H1
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102056D
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor