+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB168ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Deeds agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD4911202 (HB168E)
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed