+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB168ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
- Conference report rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
- Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House acceded to request for second conference committee
- Second conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: LaRock, Albo, Toscano
- Conference substitute printed 16106373D-H1
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Carrico, Favola, Marsden
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 11-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators: Carrico, Favola, Marsden
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates: LaRock, Albo, Toscano
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 16105869D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB168S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105869D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105869D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103068D