+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0979)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1679ER2)
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 979 (effective-see bill)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1679ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 992594296-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 992594296
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor