+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective - see bill)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1678ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 4-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1678H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107627D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Incorporates HB1643 (Ayala)
- Committee substitute printed 20107627D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 20102034D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Joseph C. Lindsey
Type:
Primary Sponsor