+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1673ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1673H2
- Substitute by Delegate Bell agreed to 23106349D-H2
- Floor substitute printed 23106349D-H2 (Bell)
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee Courts of Justice substitute rejected 23105482D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23105482D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101889D
+ − Impact Statements (8)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2023: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2023: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2023: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N)
February 1, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor