+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1672ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed LD8826352
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor