+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102214D
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor