+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
- VOTE: DEFEATED (27-Y 71-N)
- Defeated by House (27-Y 71-N)
- Read third time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/31/02 030990972
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: DEFEATED (27-Y 71-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 2-N)
January 20, 2003: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor