+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1653ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N 1-A)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 6-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1653ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (87-Y 10-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 16-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 073016216-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1653E
- Amendment by Delegate Armstrong agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 6-N)
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On December 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073016216
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2007: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 16-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor