+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 54 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1653ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (89-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On December 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 097763460
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2009: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2009: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor