+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0146)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 146 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1652ER)
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Compensation & General ...
On December 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 055020164
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2005: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor