+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1570-Black) by voice vote
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 15-N 1-A)
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (16-Y 6-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/06/00 013064976
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 15-N 1-A)
January 18, 2001: Reported from Tra. (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor