+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Left in General Laws and Technology
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N)
- Committee amendments
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 20105275D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2020: Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
February 6, 2020: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N)
February 4, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeion A. Ward
Type:
Primary Sponsor