+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1649ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (85-Y 12-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1649H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053325448-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053325448-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (15-Y 7-N)
On December 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054272448
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from C. C. T. with sub (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor