+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 86 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1648ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
- Read third time and passed House (70-Y 29-N)
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11103405D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1648E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 6-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103405D