+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1647ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N 1-A)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (90-Y 7-N 1-A)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 050265448-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1647E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On December 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 050265448
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N 1-A)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2005: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor