+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1646ER)
- Enrolled
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101569D
+ − Votes (6)
February 8, 2017: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor