+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 7, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1646ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1646ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 971636202-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 971636202-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 971636202-S1
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 974341202-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 974341202-H1
- Communicated to Senate
- Constitutional reading dispensed (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (93-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 974341202-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/26/96 971262202