+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0890)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 890 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1644ER)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N)
- Read third time and passed House (65-Y 34-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 030970824-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. Marshall, R. G. agreed to
- Read second time
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 10, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/30/02 030970824
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 15, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N)
January 10, 2003: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor