+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0269)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 269 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105128D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1642S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105128D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105128D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104066D-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104066D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101756D