+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 453 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 19107695D-H3
- Amended by conference committee
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators: Saslaw, Favola, Black
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Delegates: Hope, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 19106609D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106609D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1642S1
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106609D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute from Militia, Police and Public Safety rejected 19105712D-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19106306D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H2
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106306D-H2
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Committee substitute printed 19105712D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100672D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
February 23, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
February 12, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor