+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 34-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 13105288D-S1 (59-Y 34-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Senator Reeves agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105288D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (24-Y 16-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1642S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (21-Y 17-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105288D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N)
- Read third time and passed House (70-Y 30-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104435D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1642H1
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104435D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103598D