+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 12-N)
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 054237448-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1642E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (14-Y 7-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On December 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054237448
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 21, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N)
January 17, 2005: Reported from C. J. with amendments (14-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor