+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
On March 26, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1641ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 053022448-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1641E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1
On December 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053022448
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Finance with amds (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor