+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB164ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 814 (effective 4/22/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (92-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB164ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 8-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (32-Y 7-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (9-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987600350-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (24-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987600350
- Referred to Committee on Claims