+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 199 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1639ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
- Amendments by Senator Petersen rejected
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13102004D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1639E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102004D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 1, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor