+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 20105228D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N)
January 31, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Ronnie R. Campbell
Type:
Primary Sponsor