+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 636 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1635ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039093408-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 039093408-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039093408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N)
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 031011856-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 031011856-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 031011856-H1
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (20-Y 2-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/27/02 032262856
+ − Votes (6)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
January 27, 2003: Reported from Finance with sub (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor