+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (35-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1633ER2)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. (35-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1633ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 995204146-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 995204146
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 1999: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOM. (35-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor