+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
On March 9, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1632ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (20-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/96 973012297