+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Courts of Justice
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Read third time
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Wills/Trusts/Estates
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD8729358
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N)
January 30, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor