+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1631ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (89-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On December 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093463592
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2009: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor