+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (14-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19100888D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1630E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
On October 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100888D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2019: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (14-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor