+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 7/1/94)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB163ER)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD5905202 (HB163E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor