+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1002 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1002)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1627ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 35-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (65-Y 35-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
- Read third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1627E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 20105343D-E
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 20105343D
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 35-N)
February 25, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 17-N)
February 21, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (10-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeffrey M. Bourne
Type:
Primary Sponsor