+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1627ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 8-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (90-Y 8-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1627H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 072571256-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 072571256-H1
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On September 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072503256