+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Requires 66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (60-Y 39-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto (60-Y 39-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (62-Y 37-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (62-Y 37-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (60-Y 40-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Garrett agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 13-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1626H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104226D-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104226D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101628D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (60-Y 39-N)
February 19, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (62-Y 37-N)
February 19, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N)
February 17, 2015: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 13-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
January 29, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N)
January 26, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor