+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 3/23/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (91-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 6-N)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11102200D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1626E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/11 11102200D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (91-Y 6-N)
February 21, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor