+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 403 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1624ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Senate sub. w/amd. agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 011028948-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub.w/amd. 011028948-ES1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 011028948-S1
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 010800948-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 010800948-H1
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 010800948-H1
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from M. & P. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to M. & P. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/29/00 012222948
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from M. & P. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor