+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 614 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1623ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (82-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On August 23, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 060008132