+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 5, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102825D
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2010: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor