+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (2-Y 11-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (77-Y 19-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N)
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On December 16, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054373348
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2005: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (2-Y 11-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 19-N)
January 31, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor