+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (60)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1617ER)
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by temporarily
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute accepted by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (38-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 88-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (7-Y 88-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Delegates: Griffith, Joannou, Cranwell
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Mims, Forbes, Houck
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 011976748-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 015528536-S2 (Kenneth W. Stolle)
- Substitute by Sen. Stolle agreed to 015528536-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute 015528536-S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 011976748-S1
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 012351748-EH1
- Engrossed by House - com. substitute w/amd 012351748-H1
- Amendment by Del. Griffith agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 012351748-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 012351748-H1
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 11, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Tra. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 11/20/00 012205748
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 24, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (38-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 88-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
January 11, 2001: Reported from Tra. (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor