+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 299 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1616ER)
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (93-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 974715184-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (18-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/96 974715184