+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1501-Cosgrove) (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1613H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053558272-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053558272-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: Subcommittee # 2
On December 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 058868272
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2005: Incorporated by Tra. (HB1501-Cosgrove) (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
January 20, 2005: Reported from Tra. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor