+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (60)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
- Enacted, Chapter 766 (effective - see bill)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1611ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1611ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104725D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 11104725D-EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Athey agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1611EH1
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104725D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101897D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
February 15, 2011: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Amendment by Senator Petersen reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
February 3, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 26, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor