+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 196 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1611ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15102599D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1611E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102599D